This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 07/13/2016 at 17:29:04 (UTC).

Araya Wolde Giorgis VS Robert A Royal Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/19/2013 Araya Wolde Giorgis filed an Other lawsuit against Robert A Royal. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Maricopa County Southeast Regional Court Center located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Bustamante, Lori. The case status is Other - Consolidated.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5531

  • Filing Date:

    09/19/2013

  • Case Status:

    Other - Consolidated

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Bustamante, Lori

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Araya Wolde Giorgis

Defendants

Robert A Royal

Brett Hager

Michael Tiffany

Mark Bosco

Michael Bosco

Tiffany & Bosco P A

Steven A Burd

Safeway Inc

Katelin Doe

Ken Doe

Levi Doe

Deanna R Rader

Sean M Carroll

Gordon & Rees

John W Cory

Becky Merryman

Arizona Orthopaedic Ankle & Foot Center

Geico

Cabrera Auscencio And Infinity Ins Co

30 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Jamie Mayrose

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/17/2014
  • Docket021 - ME: Nunc Pro Tunc Order (docket date:4/15/2014)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2014
  • Docket025 - ME: Case Status Minute Entry (docket date:3/7/2014)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2014
  • Docket023 - ME: Order Entered By Court (docket date:3/7/2014)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2014
  • Docket019 - ME: Ruling (docket date:2/18/2014)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2013
  • Docket053 - ME: Case Consolidation (docket date:3/11/2014)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2013
  • Docket019 - ME: Ruling (docket date:11/12/2013)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2013
  • Docket066 - ME: Case Reassigned (docket date:11/1/2013)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2013
  • DocketNJR - Notice of change of Judge for right (docket date:10/29/2013) (filing party: Plaintiff(1))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2013
  • DocketCAN - Credit Memo Appearance Fee Paid (docket date:10/16/2013)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2013
  • DocketMCD - Motion To Consolidate (docket date:10/16/2013)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2013
  • DocketNOTE: DEFENDANT GORDON & REES LLPS MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE OR ALTERNATIVE MOTION TO TRANSFER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2013
  • DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:9/23/2013) (filing party: Plaintiff(1))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2013
  • DocketCCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject (docket date:9/23/2013) (filing party: Plaintiff(1))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2013
  • DocketCSH - Coversheet (docket date:9/23/2013) (filing party: Plaintiff(1))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2013
  • DocketORD - Order (docket date:9/23/2013) (filing party: Plaintiff(1))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2013
  • DocketADW - Application Deferral/Waiver (docket date:9/23/2013) (filing party: Plaintiff(1))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less