This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 06/15/2016 at 14:30:16 (UTC).

Anthony P Taylor Et Al VS Robert L Daniele Et Al

Case Summary

On 04/30/2009 Anthony P Taylor filed an Other lawsuit against Robert L Daniele. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Southeast Court Complex located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Talamante, David. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1500

  • Filing Date:

    04/30/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southeast Court Complex

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Talamante, David

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Anthony P Taylor

Allison Taylor

Jeffrey A Buehrle

Kathy S Buehrle

Defendants

Robert L Daniele

Blandford Homes L L C

M & I Marshall & Ilsley Bank

Sonoran Desert Holdings L L C

Ava E Lortie

Joce P Lortie

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Brent Bryson

Defendant Attorney

Dennis Wilenchik

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/03/2012
  • 042 - ME: Case Dismissed - Full (docket date:2/3/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2011
  • OCC - Order Continuing On Inactive Calendar (docket date:6/14/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2011
  • NOTE: ORDER CONTINUING CASE ONINACTIVE CALENDAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2011
  • STP - Stipulation (docket date:6/8/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2011
  • NOTE: Stipulation and Joint Motion to Continue Case on Inactive Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2011
  • OCC - Order Continuing On Inactive Calendar (docket date:5/23/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2011
  • STP - Stipulation (docket date:5/9/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2011
  • NOTE: Stipulation and Joint Motion to Continue Case on Inactive Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2011
  • ODI - Order Of Dismissal (docket date:4/28/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2011
  • NOTE: WITH PREJUDICE BETWEEN DIAMOND MASONRY INC AND JEFFREY A BUEHRLE AND KATHY S BUEHRLE AND ANTHONY P TAYLOR AND ALLISON TAYLOR

    Read MoreRead Less
162 More Docket Entries
  • 05/27/2009
  • MTD - Motion To Dismiss (docket date:6/1/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2009
  • NOTE: OR FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2009
  • SOF - Statement Of Facts (docket date:6/2/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2009
  • NOTE: DEFENDANT'S SEPARATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2009
  • CAN - Credit Memo Appearance Fee Paid (docket date:6/3/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2009
  • SUM - Summons (docket date:5/14/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2009
  • AFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:5/20/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2009
  • NOTE: BLANDFORD HOMES LLC SERVED 05/07/09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2009
  • COM - Complaint (docket date:5/1/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2009
  • CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject (docket date:5/1/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less