This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 02/03/2017 at 10:56:27 (UTC).

Anne Marie Henderson, Tierney Rice Et Al

Case Summary

On 11/08/2016 Anne Marie Henderson, Tierney Rice was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Central Court Building located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is VandenBerg, Lisa. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********3988

  • Filing Date:

    11/08/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Courthouse:

    Central Court Building

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

VandenBerg, Lisa

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Anne Marie Henderson

Guardian Ad Litem

Tierney Rice

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Kelly Sifferman

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

01/25/2017

016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted (docket date:1/25/2017)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/21/2016

PNM - Proof and/ or/ Notice of Mailing (docket date:12/29/2016)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/21/2016

NOTE: REGARDING A MATTER OF AN ADULT ADOPTION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/21/2016

NOH - Notice Of Hearing (docket date:1/3/2017)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/21/2016

NOTE: REGARDING PETITION FOR APPROVAL OF ADOPTION AGREEMENT FOR AN ADULT AND FOR DECREE OF ADOPTION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/21/2016

MFR - Motion For Reconsideration (docket date:1/3/2017)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/19/2016

002 - ME: Hearing Vacated (docket date:12/19/2016)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/08/2016

APE - Application/Petition (docket date:11/10/2016)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/08/2016

PIF - Probate Information Sheet/Form - Restricted Access (docket date:11/10/2016)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/08/2016

MOT - Motion (docket date:11/10/2016)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/08/2016

NOTE: TO WAIVE BIRTH CERTIFICATE OF ADULT CHILD

[+] Read More [-] Read Less