This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 03/06/2021 at 01:04:56 (UTC).

Ankit Walker Akula Deendayaker VS Metilda Susanna Vinod Akula

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 Ankit Walker Akula Deendayaker filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against Metilda Susanna Vinod Akula. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Central Court Building located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is LeMaire, Kerstin. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********4117

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Court Building

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

LeMaire, Kerstin

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Ankit Walker Akula Deendayaker

Respondent

Metilda Susanna Vinod Akula

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/15/2020
  • HearingEvent: Resolution Management Conference; Result: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • JudgementJudgment Against:, Frequency: One Time, Type: Judgment Only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Copy of Decree Mailed/Provided to parties on date of filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketCDS - Consent Decree (docket date:12/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • DocketNOS - Notice Of Settlement (docket date:12/9/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • Docket700 - ME: Resolution Management Conference Set (docket date:10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Response to Amended Petition for Dissolution of Marriage Without Minor Children PD 274 R# 27990635

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketANS - Answer (docket date:10/20/2020) (filing party: Respondent(2))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Family Department Sensitive Data Coversheet Without Children

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketSDS - Sensitive Data Sheet - Restricted Access (docket date:10/20/2020) (filing party: Respondent(2))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketAFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketAMC - Amended Complaint (docket date:10/1/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNCH - Notice To Convert Health Ins (docket date:9/24/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketPIN - Preliminary Injunction (docket date:9/24/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketSUM - Summons (docket date:9/24/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketSDS - Sensitive Data Sheet - Restricted Access (docket date:9/24/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:9/24/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less