This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 02/25/2021 at 11:29:48 (UTC).

Angeline Konopa, Edward Konopa Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 Angeline Konopa, Edward Konopa was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Northwest Regional Court Center located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is McGuire, J. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1164

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Northwest Regional Court Center

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

McGuire, J

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Edward Konopa

Decedent

Angeline Konopa

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Wayne Marsh

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/21/2020
  • DocketAPU - Affidavit Of Publication (docket date:10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketNIP - Notice Of Informal Probate (docket date:10/2/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketNOTE: NOTICE OF INFORMAL PROBATE OF WILL / APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND ORDER TO PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND INFORMATION TO HEIRS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketPNM - Proof and/ or/ Notice of Mailing (docket date:10/2/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketNOTE: TO CREDITORS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketNOT - Notice (docket date:10/1/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketNOTE: EDWARD KONOPA / WITHOUT RESTRICTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketLTA - Letter Of Appointment (docket date:9/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketNOTE: EDWARD KONOPA / UNLICENSED FIDUCIARY OVERVIEW / ERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketDCC - Declaration/Certificate of Completion (docket date:9/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketAAR - Accpt Appoint Personal Rep/Guard/Conservator (docket date:9/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketSIP - Statement Of Informal Probate (docket date:9/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketPAC - PROBATE REGISTRAR ACCEPTANCE (docket date:9/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketOPA - Order To Personal Representative & Acknowledgement (docket date:10/9/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketPIF - Probate Information Sheet/Form - Restricted Access (docket date:9/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCSH - Coversheet (docket date:9/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketAPE - Application/Petition (docket date:9/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketWIL - Will (docket date:9/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less