This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 02/12/2021 at 22:11:13 (UTC).

Andrew Richetto Et Al VS Surgenex Holdings L L C

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 Andrew Richetto filed an Other lawsuit against Surgenex Holdings L L C. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Northeast Regional Court Center located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Campagnolo, Theodore. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********5179

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Northeast Regional Court Center

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Campagnolo, Theodore

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Andrew Richetto

Sarah Richetto

Defendant

Surgenex Holdings L L C

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jonathan Collins

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/26/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Notice of Dismissal Pursuant to Rule 41 (a)(1) (A)(i)/ WITHOUT PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • DocketNDI - Notice Of Dismissal (docket date:10/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCSH - Coversheet (docket date:9/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject (docket date:9/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:9/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less