This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 06/28/2016 at 16:26:38 (UTC).

Andrew Perea VS Daniel Gardzina

Case Summary

On 03/03/2015 Andrew Perea filed an Other lawsuit against Daniel Gardzina. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Central Court Building located in Maricopa, Arizona. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********3214

  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Central Court Building

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Andrew Perea

Defendant

Daniel Gardzina

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David Morrison

Defendant Attorney

Thomas Burke

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

06/27/2016

MCC - Mot/Cont On Inactive Calendar (docket date:6/28/2016)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/27/2016

NOTE: Motion to Continue Arbitration and Dismissal Deadline or in the Alternative Motion to Set and Certificate of Readiness

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/05/2016

ORD - Order (docket date:4/5/2016)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/05/2016

NOTE: Order to Continue Arbitration Deadline

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/31/2016

MCO - Motion To Continue (docket date:3/31/2016)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/31/2016

NOTE: Motion to Continue Arbitration and Dismissal Deadline or in the Alternative Motion to Set and Certificate of Readiness

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/21/2016

CCA - Cert Compulsory Arbitration (docket date:3/21/2016)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/21/2016

NOTE: Amended Certificate Regarding Compulsory Arbitration

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/16/2016

398 - ME: Notice To Set Arbitrn Hrng (docket date:3/16/2016)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/10/2016

NOT - Notice (docket date:3/10/2016)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
14 More Docket Entries
07/30/2015

NOTE: Defendant's Certificate Regarding Compulsory Arbitration

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/30/2015

NJT - Not Demand For Jury Trials (docket date:7/30/2015)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/30/2015

NOTE: Demand for Jury Trial

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/30/2015

ANS - Answer (docket date:7/30/2015)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/30/2015

NOTE: ANSWER-EFILE BILLING $237.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/07/2015

APU - Affidavit Of Publication (docket date:5/7/2015)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/07/2015

NOTE: Attorney's Affidavit of Service by Publication and Due Diligence

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/03/2015

COM - Complaint (docket date:3/4/2015)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/03/2015

CCS - Cerificate Arbitration - Subject To (docket date:3/4/2015)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/03/2015

CSH - Coversheet (docket date:3/4/2015)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less