Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 05/28/2016 at 10:19:37 (UTC).

Andrew Lauren Cabinets L L C Et Al VS Sonoran Air Inc Et Al

Case Summary

On 04/01/2009 Andrew Lauren Cabinets L L C filed an Other lawsuit against Sonoran Air Inc. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Southeast Court Complex located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Gentry, Jo Lynn. The case status is Other - Consolidated.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0772

  • Filing Date:

    04/01/2009

  • Case Status:

    Other - Consolidated

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southeast Court Complex

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Gentry, Jo Lynn

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Andrew Lauren Cabinets L L C

Andrew Lauren-Phoenix L L C

Defendants

Sonoran Air Inc

Strongfield Trimco Inc

Daniel G Orenstein

Wang Electric Inc

Arizona Materials L L C

Margaret Orenstein

Sutter Masonry Inc

Namwest L L C

Namwest-Brownstone L L C

Bank Of America N A

Namwest Construction & Development L L C

Brownstones At Tempe Homeowners Association, The

David H Orenstein

Danny White Painting Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jeffrey Katz

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/18/2010
  • 053 - ME: Case Consolidation (docket date:6/18/2010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2010
  • ORD - Order (docket date:5/28/2010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2010
  • NOTE: APPROVING MOTION TO EXTEND DEADLINE FOR SERVICE OF CERTAIN DEFENDANTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2010
  • AFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:6/9/2010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2010
  • NOTE: THE BROWNSTONES AT TEMPE HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION SERVED 05/17/10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2010
  • MXS - Motion To Extend Time For Service (docket date:5/21/2010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2010
  • OXS - Order To Extend Time For Service (docket date:3/26/2010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2010
  • MXS - Motion To Extend Time For Service (docket date:3/17/2010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2010
  • ORD - Order (docket date:4/23/2010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2010
  • NOTE: CONTINUING CASE ON THE ACTIVE CALENDAR

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 09/02/2009
  • 311 - ME: 150 Day Minute Entry (docket date:9/2/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2009
  • OXS - Order To Extend Time For Service (docket date:8/14/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2009
  • NOTE: 12/07/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2009
  • STP - Stipulation (docket date:8/6/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2009
  • NOTE: TO EXTEND DEADLINE FOR SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2009
  • 322 - ME: Notice Of Intent To Dismiss (docket date:7/8/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2009
  • COM - Complaint (docket date:4/3/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2009
  • CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject (docket date:4/3/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2009
  • NOT - Notice (docket date:4/3/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2009
  • NOTE: OF LIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less