This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 02/15/2021 at 06:08:32 (UTC).

Ana Lidia Meza Diaz VS Gonzalo Verduzco

Case Summary

On 02/06/2020 Ana Lidia Meza Diaz filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against Gonzalo Verduzco. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Northwest Regional Court Center located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Kiefer, Joseph. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0837

  • Filing Date:

    02/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Courthouse:

    Northwest Regional Court Center

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Kiefer, Joseph

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Ana Lidia Meza Diaz

Respondent

Gonzalo Verduzco

Minor

Party is a minor: name not published

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

08/25/2020

DocketOLP - Order Dismiss Lack Prosecution (docket date:8/25/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/08/2020

DocketNIC - Notice Of Placement Of The Case On Inactive Calendar And Of Intent To Dismiss Your Court Case (docket date:6/8/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/24/2020

DocketAFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:2/25/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/06/2020

DocketSUM - Summons (docket date:2/10/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/06/2020

DocketNCH - Notice To Convert Health Ins (docket date:2/10/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/06/2020

DocketONA - Ord & Notice Attend Parent Inf (docket date:2/10/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/06/2020

DocketAFC - Affidavit Regarding Minor Children (docket date:2/10/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/06/2020

DocketPWC - Parent Worksheet/Child Support (docket date:2/10/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/06/2020

DocketADW - Application Deferral/Waiver (docket date:2/10/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/06/2020

DocketNOTE: SOLE LEGAL DECISION-MAKING TO PARTY A

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/06/2020

DocketPPL PARENTING PLAN (docket date:2/10/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/06/2020

DocketODF - Order Deferring Court Fees (docket date:2/10/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/06/2020

DocketPIN - Preliminary Injunction (docket date:2/10/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/06/2020

DocketSDS - Sensitive Data Sheet - Restricted Access (docket date:2/10/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/06/2020

DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:2/10/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less