This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 02/10/2021 at 16:59:54 (UTC).

Amy Lynn McCardell

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 Amy Lynn McCardell was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Central Court Building located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judges overseeing this case are White, Susan and Garbarino, David. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1703

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Court Building

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judges

White, Susan

Garbarino, David

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Amy Lynn McCardell

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/02/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Copy of order mailed/provided to parties on date of filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • DocketOCN - Order Change of Name (docket date:12/7/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • HearingEvent: Name Change Hearing; Result: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCSH - Coversheet (docket date:9/25/2020) (filing party: Plaintiff(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketAPE - Application/Petition (docket date:9/25/2020) (filing party: Plaintiff(1))

    Read MoreRead Less