This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 07/13/2020 at 16:53:26 (UTC).

Amber Bohne VS Brian Bohne

Case Summary

On 11/12/2019 Amber Bohne filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against Brian Bohne. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Central Court Building located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Como, Greg. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********5069

  • Filing Date:

    11/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Court Building

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Como, Greg

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Amber Bohne

Respondent

Brian Bohne

Minor

Party is a minor: name not published

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Credit Memo/Appearance Fee Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketCAN - Credit Memo Appearance Fee Paid (docket date:2/13/2020) (filing party: Respondent(2))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketNOTE:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketIWO Income Withholding Order - Restricted Access (docket date:2/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • HearingEvent: Decree on Demand - Regular; Result: Decree Signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • JudgementJudgment Against:, Frequency: One Time, Type: Judgment Only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Copy of Decree Mailed/Provided to parties on date of filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • DocketCDS - Consent Decree (docket date:2/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • DocketOCS - Order For Child Support (docket date:2/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • DocketCEI - Current Employer Information (docket date:2/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 11/12/2019
  • DocketACS - Acceptance Of Service (docket date:11/13/2019) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • DocketNOTE: JOINT LEGAL DECISION MAKING JOINT LEGAL CUSTODY WITH JOINT LEGAL DECISION MAKING JOINT LEGAL CUSTODY AGREEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • DocketPPL PARENTING PLAN (docket date:11/13/2019) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • DocketAFC - Affidavit Regarding Minor Children (docket date:11/13/2019) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • DocketNCH - Notice To Convert Health Ins (docket date:11/13/2019) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • DocketONA - Ord & Notice Attend Parent Inf (docket date:11/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • DocketPIN - Preliminary Injunction (docket date:11/13/2019) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • DocketSUM - Summons (docket date:11/13/2019) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • DocketSDS - Sensitive Data Sheet - Restricted Access (docket date:11/13/2019) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:11/13/2019) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less