Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 07/16/2016 at 07:37:46 (UTC).

Alterna Capital Management L L C VS Phoenix Real Asset Management L L C Et Al

Case Summary

On 04/01/2014 Alterna Capital Management L L C filed an Other lawsuit against Phoenix Real Asset Management L L C. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Southeast Court Complex located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Talamante, David. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2887

  • Filing Date:

    04/01/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southeast Court Complex

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Talamante, David

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Alterna Capital Management L L C

Defendants

Phoenix Real Asset Management L L C

K M A, I I, L L C

J P Morgan Chase Bank N A

Super Quick Lending L L C

Alexander Nieves Alejandrez

Eduardo Orlando Nieves Ramos

Carmen Luisa Alejandrez Tejada

Eduardo Nieves Alejandrez

Yamisleidys B Aguilar

City Of Phoenix

Geez L L C

State Of Arizona

R S F Homeowners Association

Silverthorn Estates Community Association

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Eric Kessler

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/12/2015
  • RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail (docket date:5/13/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2015
  • RNM - Returned Mail Minute Entry (docket date:5/6/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2015
  • NOTE: Returned Mail Minute Entry

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2015
  • 042 - ME: Case Dismissed - Full (docket date:4/20/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2015
  • RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail (docket date:3/9/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2015
  • 375 - Case on Dismissal Calendar (docket date:2/6/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2014
  • APU - Affidavit Of Publication (docket date:6/11/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2014
  • NOTE: Affidavit of Publication

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2014
  • AFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:6/17/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2014
  • NOTE: ALEXANDER NIEVES ALEJANDREZ

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 06/03/2014
  • NOTE: EDUARDO ORLANDO NIEVES RAMOS & CARMEN LUISA ALEJANDREZ TEJEDA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2014
  • AFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:6/3/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2014
  • NOTE: JP MORGAN CAHSE BANK NA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2014
  • AFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:5/22/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2014
  • NOTE: GEEZ LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2014
  • AFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:4/21/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2014
  • NOTE: PHOENIX REAL ASSET MANAGEMENT LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2014
  • COM - Complaint (docket date:4/2/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2014
  • CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject (docket date:4/2/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2014
  • CSH - Coversheet (docket date:4/2/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less