This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 10/23/2020 at 04:18:39 (UTC).

Alphonso Arcuri VS Cynthia Arcuri

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 Alphonso Arcuri filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against Cynthia Arcuri. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Southeast Court Complex located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Davis, Marvin. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********6891

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southeast Court Complex

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Davis, Marvin

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Alphonso Arcuri

Respondent

Cynthia Arcuri

Minor

Party is a minor: name not published

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Haley Terrell

Respondent Attorney

Glenn Halterman

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/12/2020
  • DocketNAR - Notice Of Appearance (docket date:10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • DocketANS - Answer (docket date:10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • DocketSDS - Sensitive Data Sheet - Restricted Access (docket date:10/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketAFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:10/1/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNCH - Notice To Convert Health Ins (docket date:9/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketONA - Ord & Notice Attend Parent Inf (docket date:9/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketPIN - Preliminary Injunction (docket date:9/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketSUM - Summons (docket date:9/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketSDS - Sensitive Data Sheet - Restricted Access (docket date:9/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:9/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less