This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 03/04/2021 at 16:54:27 (UTC).

Ally Bank VS Manuel Stevens Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 Ally Bank filed an Other lawsuit against Manuel Stevens. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Central Court Building located in Maricopa, Arizona. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1691

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Court Building

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ally Bank

Defendants

Manuel Stevens

Sonia Stevens

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Whitney Jacobson

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketNOTE: Statement of Costs and Notice of Taxation of Costs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketSOC - Statement Of Costs (docket date:2/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketNOTE: Request for Entry of Default Judgment Without Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketMAJ - Mot/Aff Entry Def Jud W/O Hear (docket date:2/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketNOTE: Affidavit in Support of Request for Entry of Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketAFF - Affidavit (docket date:2/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • Docket023 - ME: Order Entered By Court (docket date:1/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketNOTE: Application for and Affidavit on Entry of Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketAAE - Application/Affidavit And Entry Of Default (docket date:1/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketNOTE: Notice of Amended Caption

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 12/24/2020
  • DocketNOTE: MANUEL STEVENS AND J DOE SPOUSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2020
  • DocketAFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:12/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • DocketOXS - Order To Extend Time For Service (docket date:12/7/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Ex Parte Motion for Additional Time to Serve

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketMXS - Motion To Extend Time For Service (docket date:11/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • DocketNOTE: SONIA STEVENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • DocketAFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:10/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCCS - Cerificate Arbitration - Subject To (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCSH - Coversheet (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less