This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 02/10/2021 at 16:54:20 (UTC).

Ally Bank VS Charles E Riley

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 Ally Bank filed an Other lawsuit against Charles E Riley. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Central Court Building located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Mahoney, Margaret. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1696

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Court Building

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Mahoney, Margaret

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ally Bank

Defendant

Charles E Riley

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Whitney Jacobson

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketNOTE: Ex Parte Motion for Additional time to Serve

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketMXS - Motion To Extend Time For Service (docket date:1/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketNOTE: AUTHORIZING ALTERNATIVE OR SUBSTITUTE SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketORD - Order (docket date:12/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Motion for Leave for Alternative or Substitute Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketMOT - Motion (docket date:11/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCSH - Coversheet (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCCS - Cerificate Arbitration - Subject To (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less