This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 02/10/2021 at 16:54:06 (UTC).

Ally Bank VS Carlos V Gomez Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 Ally Bank filed an Other lawsuit against Carlos. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Central Court Building located in Maricopa, Arizona. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1693

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Court Building

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ally Bank

Defendants

Maria Gomez

Carlos V Gomez

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Whitney Jacobson

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/05/2021
  • JudgementJudgment For: Ally Bank Judgment Against: Maria Gomez Judgment Against: Carlos V Gomez, Amount: $21,008.85, Frequency: One Time, Type: Principal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • JudgementJudgment For: Ally Bank Judgment Against: Maria Gomez Judgment Against: Carlos V Gomez, Amount: $429.50, Frequency: One Time, Type: Costs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketNOTE: Copy mailed/provided to non-defl. parties on date of filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketDFJ - Default Judgment (docket date:1/6/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Statement of Costs and Notice of Taxation of Costs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketSOC - Statement Of Costs (docket date:12/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Request for Entry of Default Judgment Without Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketMAJ - Mot/Aff Entry Def Jud W/O Hear (docket date:12/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Affidavit in Support of Request for Entry of Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketAAE - Application/Affidavit And Entry Of Default (docket date:12/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 11/20/2020
  • DocketNOT - Notice (docket date:11/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Application for and Affidavit on Entry of Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • DocketAAE - Application/Affidavit And Entry Of Default (docket date:11/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • DocketNOTE: CARLOS V GOMEZ AND MARIA GOMEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • DocketAFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:10/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • DocketNOTE: MARIA GOMEZ AND J DOE SPOUSE AKA CARLOS GOMEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • DocketAFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:10/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCCS - Cerificate Arbitration - Subject To (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCSH - Coversheet (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less