This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 02/10/2021 at 16:54:01 (UTC).

Ally Bank VS Brittney Price Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 Ally Bank filed an Other lawsuit against Brittney Price. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Central Court Building located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is White, Susan. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1692

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Court Building

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

White, Susan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ally Bank

Defendants

Brittney Price

Karl Price

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Whitney Jacobson

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/05/2021
  • JudgementJudgment For: Ally Bank Judgment Against: Karl Price Judgment Against: Brittney Price, Amount: $15,958.54, Frequency: One Time, Type: Principal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • JudgementJudgment For: Ally Bank Judgment Against: Karl Price Judgment Against: Brittney Price, Amount: $422.80, Frequency: One Time, Type: Costs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketNOTE: Copy mailed/provided to non-defl. parties on date of filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketDFJ - Default Judgment (docket date:1/6/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Affidavit in Support of Request for Entry of Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketAAE - Application/Affidavit And Entry Of Default (docket date:12/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Request for Entry of Default Judgment Without Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketMAJ - Mot/Aff Entry Def Jud W/O Hear (docket date:12/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Statement of Costs and Notice of Taxation of Costs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketSOC - Statement Of Costs (docket date:12/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 11/16/2020
  • Docket023 - ME: Order Entered By Court (docket date:11/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Application for and Affidavit on Entry of Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketAAE - Application/Affidavit And Entry Of Default (docket date:11/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketNOTE: KARL PRICE CO OCCUPANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketAFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:10/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketNOTE: KARL PRICE AND J DOE SPOUSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketAFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:10/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCSH - Coversheet (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCCS - Cerificate Arbitration - Subject To (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less