Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 06/29/2016 at 15:57:32 (UTC).

Allen Kern Et Al VS Kay A Zahn Et Al

Case Summary

On 04/22/2014 Allen Kern filed an Other lawsuit against Kay A Zahn. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Central Court Building located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Gentry, Jo Lynn. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********7187

  • Filing Date:

    04/22/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Court Building

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Gentry, Jo Lynn

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Allen Kern

Kern Family Revocable Trust, The

Bradley Kern

Evan Kern

Barrett Silver

Robert K Karp

Estate Of John Arthur Chew

Scott Moss

Aldo Cademartori

Arthur Elias

Defendants

Kay A Zahn

James R Zahn

A S I Communications Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

THOMAS LUIKENS

John Gilbert

Defendant Attorney

FRANK FOX

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/27/2016
  • ODI - Order Of Dismissal (docket date:5/27/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2016
  • NOTE: ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2016
  • SFD - Stipulation For Dismissal (docket date:5/23/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2016
  • NOTE: Stipulation to Dismiss With Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2016
  • 375 - Case on Dismissal Calendar (docket date:4/18/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2016
  • NOS - Notice Of Settlement (docket date:4/11/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2016
  • NOTE: Notice of Settlement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2016
  • NOT - Notice (docket date:3/28/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2016
  • NOTE: Notice of Service of Verifications

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2016
  • SOF - Statement Of Facts (docket date:3/29/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
67 More Docket Entries
  • 04/29/2014
  • AFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:5/7/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2014
  • NOTE: JAMES R ZAHN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2014
  • AFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:5/7/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2014
  • NOTE: ASI COMMUNICATIONS INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2014
  • AFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:5/7/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2014
  • NOT - Notice (docket date:4/24/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2014
  • NOTE: NOTICE OF ERRATA IN CAPTION ONLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2014
  • COM - Complaint (docket date:4/23/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2014
  • CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject (docket date:4/23/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2014
  • CSH - Coversheet (docket date:4/23/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less