This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 02/03/2021 at 09:57:48 (UTC).

Allan B Mendelsohn, Joel D Mendelsohn Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 Allan B Mendelsohn, Joel D Mendelsohn was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Central Court Building located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judges overseeing this case are Mata, Julie and Palmer, Brian. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********3874

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Court Building

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judges

Mata, Julie

Palmer, Brian

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Allan B Mendelsohn

Decedent

Joel D Mendelsohn

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/02/2020
  • DocketSIP - Statement Of Informal Probate (docket date:10/6/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(2))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • DocketNOTE: ALLAN B MENDELSOHN / WITHOUT RESTRICTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • DocketLTA - Letter Of Appointment (docket date:10/6/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(2))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • DocketPAC - PROBATE REGISTRAR ACCEPTANCE (docket date:10/6/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • DocketOPA - Order To Personal Representative & Acknowledgement (docket date:10/6/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketNOTE: FOR INFORMAL PROBATE OF WILL AND FOR INFORMAL APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketAPL - Application (docket date:10/5/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(2))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketCSH - Coversheet (docket date:10/2/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketNOTE: DENIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketPAC - PROBATE REGISTRAR ACCEPTANCE (docket date:9/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCSH - Coversheet (docket date:9/25/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(2))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketAPE - Application/Petition (docket date:9/25/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(2))

    Read MoreRead Less