This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 02/12/2021 at 22:12:26 (UTC).

Ali Alzowaini Et Al VS Viviana Delgado Cedeno

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 Ali Alzowaini filed an Other lawsuit against Viviana Delgado Cedeno. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Northeast Regional Court Center located in Maricopa, Arizona. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********5194

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Northeast Regional Court Center

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Ali Alzowaini

Mohamed Alzowaini

Ayad Alzowaini

Defendant

Viviana Delgado Cedeno

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Robert Ramirez

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketNOTE: VIVIANA DELGADO CEDENO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketAFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:1/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketNOTE: Affidavit of Service of Process / VIVIANA DELGADO CEDEND AND GUILLERMO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketAFF - Affidavit (docket date:1/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCSH - Coversheet (docket date:9/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCCS - Cerificate Arbitration - Subject To (docket date:9/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:9/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less