This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 02/10/2021 at 17:02:09 (UTC).

Alexandra Sherlock VS Theresa Lynn Jackson

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 Alexandra Sherlock filed an Other lawsuit against Theresa Lynn Jackson. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Central Court Building located in Maricopa, Arizona. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1733

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Court Building

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Alexandra Sherlock

Defendant

Theresa Lynn Jackson

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Eddie Pantiliat

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/02/2020
  • DocketNOTE: THERESA LYNN JACKSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • DocketAFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:11/4/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketSUM - Summons (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Certificate Of Compulsory Arbitration - Is Subject To

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCCS - Cerificate Arbitration - Subject To (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Civil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCSH - Coversheet (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNOTE: COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less