This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 02/10/2021 at 16:59:50 (UTC).

Alexandra Kellogg VS Elite Taxi Cab L L C Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 Alexandra Kellogg filed an Other lawsuit against Elite Taxi Cab L L C. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Central Court Building located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Kemp, Michael. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1702

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Court Building

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Kemp, Michael

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Alexandra Kellogg

Defendants

Sonia Martinez

Elite Taxi Cab L L C

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

David Panzarella

Matthew McLaughlin

Defendant Attorney

Kristen Briney

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketNOTE: Defendants' Certificate Regarding Compulsory Arbitration and Demand for Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketCCA - Cert Compulsory Arbitration (docket date:1/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketNOTE: Answer of Defendants Elite Taxi Cab, LLC and Sonia Martinez/ efile billing $245

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketANS - Answer (docket date:1/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketNOTE: JOHN DOE MARTINEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketAFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:12/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketNOTE: SONIA MARTINEZ AND ELITE TAXI CAB LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketAPU - Affidavit Of Publication (docket date:12/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Notice of Change of Attorney Within Firm

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketNOT - Notice (docket date:10/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketSUM - Summons (docket date:9/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketSUM - Summons (docket date:9/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Certificate Of Compulsory Arbitration - Is Not Subject To

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject (docket date:9/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Civil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCSH - Coversheet (docket date:9/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:9/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less