This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 11/04/2019 at 04:37:14 (UTC).

Albert Dube, Lorena Dube Et Al

Case Summary

On 04/18/2019 Albert Dube, Lorena Dube was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Southeast Court Complex located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is White, Susan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0508

  • Filing Date:

    04/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Courthouse:

    Southeast Court Complex

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

White, Susan

 

Party Details

Petitioners

Lorena Dube

Albert Dube

Not Classified By Court

Party is a minor: name not published

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Chris Anderson

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

06/27/2019

421- Appoint Guardian/Consev (docket date:6/27/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/25/2019

LTA - Letter Of Appointment (docket date:6/27/2019) (filing party: Petitioner(2))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/25/2019

NOTE: ALBERT AND LORENA DUBE / WITH RESTRICTION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/25/2019

OAG - Order Appointing Guardian Incap Person (docket date:7/1/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/25/2019

OGA - Order To Guardian(s) & Acknowledgement (docket date:7/1/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/25/2019

ORD - Order (docket date:7/1/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/25/2019

NOTE: FOR COMPLIANCE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/17/2019

DCC - Declaration/Certificate of Completion (docket date:6/20/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/17/2019

NOTE: LORENA DUBE / UNLICENSED FIDUCIARY OVERVIEW AND GUARDIANSHIP

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/17/2019

DCC - Declaration/Certificate of Completion (docket date:6/20/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
8 More Docket Entries
04/29/2019

NOTE: INVESTIGATOR AND GUARDIANSHIP

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/25/2019

NOH - Notice Of Hearing (docket date:5/1/2019) (filing party: Petitioner(2))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/25/2019

NOTE: REGARDING GUARDIANSHIP

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/18/2019

APE - Application/Petition (docket date:4/18/2019) (filing party: Petitioner(2))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/18/2019

PIF - Probate Information Sheet/Form - Restricted Access (docket date:4/18/2019) (filing party: Petitioner(2))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/18/2019

AFP - Affidavit of Proposed Appointee (docket date:4/18/2019) (filing party: Petitioner(2))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/18/2019

NOTE: LORENA DUBE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/18/2019

AFP - Affidavit of Proposed Appointee (docket date:4/18/2019) (filing party: Petitioner(2))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/18/2019

NOTE: ALBERT DUBE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/18/2019

MDR Medical Report Confidential (docket date:4/19/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less