This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 02/12/2021 at 22:13:03 (UTC).

Ahwatukee L L C VS A Z C S 3 Ray L L C Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 Ahwatukee L L C filed an Other lawsuit against A Z C S 3 Ray L L C. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Northeast Regional Court Center located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judges overseeing this case are Russell, Andrew and Agne, Sara. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********5200

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Northeast Regional Court Center

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judges

Russell, Andrew

Agne, Sara

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ahwatukee L L C

Defendants

Fadi Odeh

Thaer Ahmad

A Z C S 3 Ray L L C

Tahsin Khairi

Nadia Khairi

Hanaa Daghlas

Rasha Daghlas

Rasha Ahmad

A Z C S, 3 Ray L L C

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ryan Bird

Defendant Attorney

Neal Bookspan

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/12/2021
  • DocketNOTE: ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO DISMISS JANE DOE DEFENDANTS WITHOUT PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • DocketODI - Order Of Dismissal (docket date:2/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketNOTE:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketRNM - Returned Mail (docket date:1/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketNOTE: STIPULATION TO DISMISS JANE DOE DEFENDANTS WITHOUT PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketSFD - Stipulation For Dismissal (docket date:1/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketNOTE: FIRST NOTICE OF EXTENSION FOR DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketNOT - Notice (docket date:1/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • DocketNOTE:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • DocketRNM - Returned Mail (docket date:1/6/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
50 More Docket Entries
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketSUM - Summons (docket date:9/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketSUM - Summons (docket date:9/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Certificate Of Compulsory Arbitration - Is Not Subject To

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject (docket date:9/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Civil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCSH - Coversheet (docket date:9/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:9/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less