This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 02/27/2021 at 23:03:14 (UTC).

Aghela Rasouli VS Cassie L Skenandore

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 Aghela Rasouli filed an Other lawsuit against Cassie L Skenandore. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Northeast Regional Court Center located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judges overseeing this case are Russell, Andrew and Agne, Sara. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********5168

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Northeast Regional Court Center

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judges

Russell, Andrew

Agne, Sara

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Aghela Rasouli

Defendant

Cassie L Skenandore

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Benjamin Jemsek

Defendant Attorney

Venus Booth

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/12/2021
  • HearingEvent: Pre-Trial Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketNOTE: SCHEDULING ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketSCO Scheduling Order (docket date:2/4/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • Docket023 - ME: Order Entered By Court (docket date:2/4/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketNOTE: Joint Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketJSR Joint Scheduling Report (docket date:1/8/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Plaintiff's Request for Farsi Interpreter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • DocketREQ - Request (docket date:12/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketNOTE: DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketNJT - Not Demand For Jury Trials (docket date:12/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketSUM - Summons (docket date:9/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketSUM - Summons (docket date:9/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Certificate Of Compulsory Arbitration - Is Not Subject To

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject (docket date:9/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Civil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCSH - Coversheet (docket date:9/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:9/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less