This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 02/10/2021 at 17:01:12 (UTC).

Aaron Chavez VS Katie M Bosgieter Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 Aaron Chavez filed an Other lawsuit against Katie M Bosgieter. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Central Court Building located in Maricopa, Arizona. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1721

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Court Building

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Aaron Chavez

Defendants

Taylor Michelle Brooks

Katie M Bosgieter

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Joseph Zebas

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketOXS - Order To Extend Time For Service (docket date:1/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketNOTE: MOTION TO SERVE DEFENDANTS BY PUBLICATION AND EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERVE DEFENDANTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketMXS - Motion To Extend Time For Service (docket date:12/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketSUM - Summons (docket date:9/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketSUM - Summons (docket date:9/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Certificate Of Compulsory Arbitration - Is Subject To

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCCS - Cerificate Arbitration - Subject To (docket date:9/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Civil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCSH - Coversheet (docket date:9/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Complaint (Tort - Motor Vehicle)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:9/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less