This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 02/24/2021 at 18:55:54 (UTC).

Aaron Blackwell VS Nikki Blackwell

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 Aaron Blackwell filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against Nikki Blackwell. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Southeast Court Complex located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Ponce, Adele. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********6885

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southeast Court Complex

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Ponce, Adele

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Aaron Blackwell

Respondent

Nikki Blackwell

Minor

Party is a minor: name not published

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2021
  • JudgementJudgment Against:, Frequency: One Time, Type: Judgment Only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketNOTE: Copy of Decree Mailed/Provided to parties on date of filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketCDS - Consent Decree (docket date:1/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Credit Memo/Appearance Fee Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • DocketCAN - Credit Memo Appearance Fee Paid (docket date:1/4/2021) (filing party: Respondent(2))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Parent Education Certificate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketPEC - Parent Education Certificate (docket date:12/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Parent Education Certificate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • DocketPEC - Parent Education Certificate (docket date:11/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketACS - Acceptance Of Service (docket date:10/2/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketPPL PARENTING PLAN (docket date:9/24/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketAFC - Affidavit Regarding Minor Children (docket date:9/24/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketONA - Ord & Notice Attend Parent Inf (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNCH - Notice To Convert Health Ins (docket date:9/24/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketPIN - Preliminary Injunction (docket date:9/24/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketSUM - Summons (docket date:9/24/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketSDS - Sensitive Data Sheet - Restricted Access (docket date:9/24/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:9/24/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less