Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 05/29/2016 at 00:24:05 (UTC).

A K & J Sealants L L C VS Bryan Dean Miller Et Al

Case Summary

On 06/03/2009 A K J Sealants L L C filed an Other lawsuit against Bryan Dean Miller. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Northeast Regional Court Center located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Anderson, Aimee. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********7941

  • Filing Date:

    06/03/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Northeast Regional Court Center

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Anderson, Aimee

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

A K & J Sealants L L C

Defendants

Bryan Dean Miller

Ronald D Weller

Ruth E Bernel

Fort McDowell Yavapai Nation

Old Republic General Insurance Corporation

Northern Trust National Association

Kevin Miller

William G Bernel

Miller Brothers Concrete Inc

First Arizona Savings

Brundage - Bone Concrete Pumping Inc

Cullum Homes Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

James Palecek

Defendant Attorneys

James Nearhood

Tara Miller

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/31/2010
  • 042 - ME: Case Dismissed - Full (docket date:3/31/2010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2010
  • ODI - Order Of Dismissal (docket date:3/19/2010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2010
  • NOTE: WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2010
  • SFD - Stipulation For Dismissal (docket date:3/17/2010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2010
  • NOTE: with Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2010
  • 026 - ME: Pretrial Conference Set (docket date:1/15/2010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2010
  • ORD - Order (docket date:1/14/2010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2010
  • NOTE: ORDER (allowing First Amended Complaint to be filed)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2009
  • MTA - Motion To Amend (docket date:12/4/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2009
  • NOTE: Amended Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
48 More Docket Entries
  • 07/15/2009
  • AFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:7/23/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2009
  • NOTE: NORTHERN TRUST N A SERVED 7/14/09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2009
  • ACS - Acceptance Of Service (docket date:7/6/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2009
  • NOTE: /WAIVER OF SERVICE FORT MCDOWELL YAVAPAI NATION SERVED 06/30/09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2009
  • AFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:7/9/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2009
  • NOTE: CULLUM HOMES INC SERVED 06/26/09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2009
  • COM - Complaint (docket date:6/5/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2009
  • NOT - Notice (docket date:6/5/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2009
  • NOTE: LIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2009
  • CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject (docket date:6/5/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less