This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 02/10/2021 at 17:00:08 (UTC).

$110,000.00 U S Currency, State Of Arizona Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 110,000 00 U S Currency, State Of Arizona was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Central Court Building located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is White, Susan. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1706

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Court Building

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

White, Susan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

State Of Arizona

In Re

$110,000.00 U S Currency

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Eric Rothblum

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/09/2020
  • JudgementJudgment Against:, Frequency: One Time, Type: Judgment Only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketNOTE: FINDINGS OF FACT, CONCLUSIONS OF LAW / OF FORFEITURE IN REM OF UNCLAIMED PROPERTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketJOR - Judgment And Order (docket date:11/9/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • DocketNOTE: APPLICATION FOR ORDER OF FORFEITURE IN REM OF UNCLAIMED PROPERTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • DocketAPL - Application (docket date:11/5/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCSH - Coversheet (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNPF - Notice/Pending Forfeiture (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less