This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 10/29/2019 at 17:09:25 (UTC).

WWC XIV LLLP VS MARTIN MATOTT

Case Summary

On 09/13/2017 WWC XIV LLLP filed an Other lawsuit against MARTIN MATOTT. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, East Mesa Justice Courthouse located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Russell, Keith. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0445

  • Filing Date:

    09/13/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    East Mesa Justice Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Russell, Keith

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

WWC XIV LLLP

U S COLLECTIONS WEST INC.

Defendant

MARTIN MATOTT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Scott Clark

Alan Zimmerman

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/28/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment, Sub Type: Order Discharging Garnishee, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Petition Discharging Garnishee, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Satisfaction Of Judgment, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment, Sub Type: Order of Continuing Lien, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Application for Order of Continuing Lien, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishee, Sub Type: Answer (Earnings), Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Garnishment Return, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Writ, Sub Type: Garnishment Earnings, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Assignment of Judgment, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Application for Writ of Garnishment, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Writ, Sub Type: Restitution, Result: Returned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Judgment, Sub Type: Default, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Private Process, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2017
  • Judgment For: WWC XIV LLLP Judgment Against: MARTIN MATOTT, Amount: $1,292.81, Type: Total Judgment, Status: Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.