This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 10/29/2019 at 05:24:43 (UTC).

WWC XIII LLP VS KELSEY SWICK

Case Summary

On 08/18/2017 WWC XIII LLP filed an Other lawsuit against KELSEY SWICK. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, North Mesa Justice Courthouse located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Ash, Cecil. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********4366

  • Filing Date:

    08/18/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North Mesa Justice Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Ash, Cecil

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

WWC XIII LLP

US COLLECTIONS WEST

Defendant

KELSEY SWICK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Scott Clark

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/12/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment, Sub Type: Order Discharging Garnishee, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Petition Discharging Garnishee, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Satisfaction Of Judgment, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment, Sub Type: Order of Continuing Lien, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Application for Order of Continuing Lien, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishee, Sub Type: Answer (Earnings), Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Garnishment Return, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Accounting, Sub Type: Adjustment, Result: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Writ, Sub Type: Garnishment Earnings, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Application for Writ of Garnishment, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Statement of Costs, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Assignment of Judgment, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Imaged Case File, Result: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Private Process, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2017
  • Judgment For: WWC XIII LLP Judgment Against: KELSEY SWICK, Amount: $975.01, Type: Total Judgment, Status: Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.