Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 10/31/2019 at 08:34:19 (UTC).

WELLS FARGO BANK NA VS SYDNEY RODRIGUEZ Et Al

Case Summary

On 11/17/2017 WELLS FARGO BANK NA filed an Other lawsuit against SYDNEY RODRIGUEZ. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, East Mesa Justice Courthouse located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Russell, Keith. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********8302

  • Filing Date:

    11/17/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    East Mesa Justice Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Russell, Keith

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WELLS FARGO BANK NA

Defendants

SYDNEY RODRIGUEZ

EFRAIN E RODRIGUEZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ronald Horwitz

Defendant Attorney

Leonard Sominsky

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/17/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Stipulation, Sub Type: Dismiss With Prejudice, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Ruling on Motion, Sub Type: Summary Judgment, Result: Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Ruling on Motion, Sub Type: Vacate, Result: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Settlement, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Order, Sub Type: Undesignated, Result: Moot

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Proof of Debt, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Proof of Debt, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Proof of Debt, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Motion, Sub Type: Summary Judgment, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Order, Sub Type: Appear Telephonically, Result: Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Motion, Sub Type: Appear Telephonically, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Comprehensive Pre Trial Conf Hearing, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Answer, Sub Type: Civil Complaint, Result: Filed by Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Private Process, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Proof of Debt, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less