This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 11/09/2019 at 07:09:40 (UTC).

WELLS FARGO BANK N.A. VS CHRISTOPHER MINSHALL

Case Summary

On 07/31/2018 WELLS FARGO BANK N A filed an Other lawsuit against CHRISTOPHER MINSHALL. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, San Marcos Justice Court located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Tibshraeny, Jay. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4252

  • Filing Date:

    07/31/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Tibshraeny, Jay

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WELLS FARGO BANK N.A.

Defendant

CHRISTOPHER MINSHALL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ronald Horwitz

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/22/2019
  • DocketEvents: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Suspending Action Due to Bankruptcy, Result: Issued/Ordered

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • DocketEvents: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Filing of Bankruptcy, Result: Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • DocketEvents: Event Type: Judgment, Sub Type: Default, Result: Issued/Ordered

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • DocketEvents: Event Type: Request, Sub Type: Affidavit for Entry of Default Judgment, Result: Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • DocketEvents: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Undesignated, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • DocketEvents: Event Type: Application for Entry of Default, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • DocketEvents: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Private Process, Result: Served

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2018
  • DocketEvents: Event Type: Order, Sub Type: Alternative Service, Result: Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • DocketEvents: Event Type: Motion, Sub Type: Alternative Service, Result: Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • DocketEvents: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Dismissal for Lack of Service, Result: Mailed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • DocketJudgment For: WELLS FARGO BANK N.A. Judgment Against: CHRISTOPHER MINSHALL, Amount: $6,484.92, Type: Principal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • DocketJudgment For: WELLS FARGO BANK N.A. Judgment Against: CHRISTOPHER MINSHALL, Amount: $925.00, Type: Attorney Fee

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • DocketJudgment For: WELLS FARGO BANK N.A. Judgment Against: CHRISTOPHER MINSHALL, Amount: $314.72, Type: Costs

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less