This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 10/28/2019 at 22:42:43 (UTC).

WATERSTONE APARTMENTS VS DOMINIQUE WHITE Et Al

Case Summary

On 08/08/2017 WATERSTONE APARTMENTS filed an Other lawsuit against DOMINIQUE WHITE. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, North Mesa Justice Courthouse located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Ash, Cecil. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********5822

  • Filing Date:

    08/08/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North Mesa Justice Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Ash, Cecil

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WATERSTONE APARTMENTS

Defendants

DOMINIQUE WHITE

NINA CROCKETT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Thayne Cullimore

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/25/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Petition Discharging Garnishee, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment, Sub Type: Order Discharging Garnishee, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Motion, Sub Type: Vacate, Result: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Petition for Order To Show Cause Re Default, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment, Sub Type: Order to Show Cause Re Garnishees Default, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Garnishment Return, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Application for Writ of Garnishment, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Motion, Sub Type: Default Judgment, Result: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Judgment, Sub Type: Default, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Pre-Trial Conference Report, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Comprehensive Pre Trial Conf Hearing, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Waiver/Deferral, Sub Type: Application for Waiver/Deferral, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Waiver/Deferral, Sub Type: Waiving Court Costs, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Answer, Sub Type: Civil Complaint, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Private Process, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • Judgment For: WATERSTONE APARTMENTS Judgment Against: NINA CROCKETT, Amount: $3,100.62, Type: Total Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.