This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 10/31/2019 at 19:47:02 (UTC).

WAKEFIELD AND ASSOCIATES, INC. VS LEEAH EBONY JOHNSON

Case Summary

On 12/07/2017 WAKEFIELD AND ASSOCIATES, INC filed an Other lawsuit against LEEAH EBONY JOHNSON. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, Agua Fria Justice Courthouse located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Guzman, Joe. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1525

  • Filing Date:

    12/07/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Agua Fria Justice Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Guzman, Joe

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WAKEFIELD AND ASSOCIATES, INC.

Defendant

LEEAH EBONY JOHNSON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Syntha Bayham

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/12/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Judgment, Sub Type: Stipulated, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Pre-Trial Conference Report, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Stipulation and Order of Judgment, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Corrective Action Notice Sent, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Undesignated, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Disclosure Statement, Sub Type: Notice of Service Re 26.1 Disclosure, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Judgment, Sub Type: Pleadings, Result: Moot

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Motion, Sub Type: Judgment on Pleadings, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Comprehensive Pre Trial Conf Hearing, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Comprehensive Pre Trial Conf Hearing, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Waiver/Deferral, Sub Type: Waiving Court Costs, Result: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Waiver/Deferral, Sub Type: Application for Waiver/Deferral, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Answer, Sub Type: Civil Complaint, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Private Process, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Dismissal for Lack of Service, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Proof of Debt, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • Judgment For: WAKEFIELD AND ASSOCIATES, INC. Judgment Against: LEEAH EBONY JOHNSON, Amount: $2,342.16, Type: Principal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • Judgment For: WAKEFIELD AND ASSOCIATES, INC. Judgment Against: LEEAH EBONY JOHNSON, Amount: $327.62, Type: Interest

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • Judgment For: WAKEFIELD AND ASSOCIATES, INC. Judgment Against: LEEAH EBONY JOHNSON, Amount: $231.68, Type: Costs

    Read MoreRead Less