Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 10/31/2019 at 05:31:47 (UTC).

VILLAGE AT LINDSAY PARK VS LAURA GOMEZ

Case Summary

On 11/14/2017 VILLAGE AT LINDSAY PARK filed an Other lawsuit against LAURA GOMEZ. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, East Mesa Justice Courthouse located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Russell, Keith. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********4702

  • Filing Date:

    11/14/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    East Mesa Justice Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Russell, Keith

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VILLAGE AT LINDSAY PARK

Defendant

LAURA GOMEZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Bradley Coleman

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/04/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment, Sub Type: Order Discharging Garnishee, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Satisfaction Of Judgment, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Petition Discharging Garnishee, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment, Sub Type: Order of Continuing Lien, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Application for Order of Continuing Lien, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishee, Sub Type: Answer (Earnings), Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Garnishment Return, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Writ, Sub Type: Garnishment Earnings, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Application for Writ of Garnishment, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Writ, Sub Type: Restitution, Result: Returned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Judgment, Sub Type: Stipulated, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Private Process, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2017
  • Judgment For: VILLAGE AT LINDSAY PARK Judgment Against: LAURA GOMEZ, Amount: $1,899.03, Type: Total Judgment, Status: Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less