This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 10/29/2019 at 00:24:18 (UTC).

VILLAGE APARTMENTS Et Al VS CHARISH WHITE

Case Summary

On 08/10/2017 VILLAGE APARTMENTS filed an Other lawsuit against CHARISH WHITE. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, Downtown Justice Courthouse located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judges overseeing this case are Medina Ochoa, Enrique and Medina, Enrique. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********7724

  • Filing Date:

    08/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Justice Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judges

Medina Ochoa, Enrique

Medina, Enrique

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

VILLAGE APARTMENTS

GIBRALTAR CAPITAL, LLC

Defendant

CHARISH WHITE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/07/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment, Sub Type: Order of Continuing Lien, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Application for Order of Continuing Lien, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishee, Sub Type: Answer, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Certificate of Service, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Writ, Sub Type: Garnishment Earnings, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Application for Writ of Garnishment, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Document Received, Sub Type: Undesignated, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Judgment, Sub Type: Default, Result: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Post/Mail, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Court Date, Result: Hearing Set

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2017
  • Judgment For: VILLAGE APARTMENTS Judgment For: GIBRALTAR CAPITAL, LLC Judgment Against: CHARISH WHITE, Amount: $885.00, Type: Rent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2017
  • Judgment For: VILLAGE APARTMENTS Judgment For: GIBRALTAR CAPITAL, LLC Judgment Against: CHARISH WHITE, Amount: $75.00, Type: Late Charge

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2017
  • Judgment For: VILLAGE APARTMENTS Judgment For: GIBRALTAR CAPITAL, LLC Judgment Against: CHARISH WHITE, Amount: $96.00, Type: Costs

    Read MoreRead Less