This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 06/22/2020 at 06:52:25 (UTC).

VICKIE TAM VS ANOTINETTE MOORE

Case Summary

On 05/28/2020 VICKIE TAM filed an Other lawsuit against ANOTINETTE MOORE. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, East Mesa Justice Courthouse located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Russell, Keith. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********7283

  • Filing Date:

    05/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    East Mesa Justice Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Russell, Keith

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VICKIE TAM

Defendant

ANOTINETTE MOORE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Chad Walton

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/02/2020
  • HearingEvent: Eviction Action Hearing; Result: Default Judgment And Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Judgment, Sub Type: Default, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • JudgementJudgment For: VICKIE TAM Judgment Against: ANOTINETTE MOORE, Amount: $4,517.00, Type: Total Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Counsel, Sub Type: Notice of Appearance, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Private Process, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less