This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 10/28/2019 at 05:38:02 (UTC).

VEROS CREDIT VS ANDY PIMENTAL ORTIZ Et Al

Case Summary

On 07/07/2017 VEROS CREDIT filed an Other lawsuit against ANDY PIMENTAL ORTIZ. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, Downtown Justice Courthouse located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judges overseeing this case are Hernandez, Jimmie and Medina, Enrique. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********4518

  • Filing Date:

    07/07/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Justice Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judges

Hernandez, Jimmie

Medina, Enrique

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VEROS CREDIT

Defendants

ANDY PIMENTAL ORTIZ

LUIS PIMENTAL BERBER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Dennis Skarecky

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/15/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Order, Sub Type: Undesignated, Result: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Motion, Sub Type: Withdraw, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment, Sub Type: Release & Quash Writ, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment, Sub Type: Order of Continuing Lien, Result: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Application for Order of Continuing Lien, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishee, Sub Type: Answer (Earnings), Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Certificate of Service, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Writ, Sub Type: Garnishment Earnings, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Application for Writ of Garnishment, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Judgment, Sub Type: Default, Result: Default Judgment And Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Counsel, Sub Type: Affidavit in Support of Attorney Fees, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Counsel, Sub Type: Statement of Costs, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Request, Sub Type: Affidavit for Entry of Default Judgment, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Application for Entry of Default, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Private Process, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Private Process, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Dismissal for Lack of Service, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • Judgment For: VEROS CREDIT Judgment Against: ANDY PIMENTAL ORTIZ Judgment Against: LUIS PIMENTAL BERBER, Amount: $7,271.01, Type: Principal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • Judgment For: VEROS CREDIT Judgment Against: ANDY PIMENTAL ORTIZ Judgment Against: LUIS PIMENTAL BERBER, Amount: $183.60, Type: Concessions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • Judgment For: VEROS CREDIT Judgment Against: ANDY PIMENTAL ORTIZ Judgment Against: LUIS PIMENTAL BERBER, Amount: $509.32, Type: Interest

    Read MoreRead Less