This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 11/11/2019 at 11:51:32 (UTC).

VERONA PARK VS CHRISTIAN RIOS

Case Summary

On 11/15/2018 VERONA PARK filed an Other lawsuit against CHRISTIAN RIOS. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, North Mesa Justice Court located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Ash, Cecil. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2685

  • Filing Date:

    11/15/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Ash, Cecil

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VERONA PARK

Defendant

CHRISTIAN RIOS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Bradley Coleman

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/14/2019
  • DocketEvents: Event Type: Garnishment, Sub Type: Order Discharging Garnishee, Result: Issued/Ordered

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • DocketEvents: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Petition Discharging Garnishee, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • DocketEvents: Event Type: Satisfaction Of Judgment, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • DocketEvents: Event Type: Garnishment, Sub Type: Order of Continuing Lien, Result: Issued/Ordered

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • DocketEvents: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Application for Order of Continuing Lien, Result: Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • DocketEvents: Event Type: Garnishee, Sub Type: Answer (Earnings), Result: Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • DocketEvents: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Garnishment Return, Result: Served

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • DocketEvents: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Application for Writ of Garnishment, Result: Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • DocketEvents: Event Type: Writ, Sub Type: Garnishment Earnings, Result: Issued/Ordered

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • DocketEvents: Event Type: Writ, Sub Type: Restitution, Result: Returned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • DocketEvents: Event Type: Imaged Case File, Result: Completed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • DocketEvents: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Post/Mail, Result: Served

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • DocketJudgment For: VERONA PARK Judgment Against: CHRISTIAN RIOS, Amount: $1,913.88, Type: Total Judgment, Status: Satisfied

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less