This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 05/27/2020 at 11:50:38 (UTC).

VALLEY INCOME PROPERTIES INC VS COURTNEY P WILBURN Et Al

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 VALLEY INCOME PROPERTIES INC filed an Other lawsuit against COURTNEY P WILBURN. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, University Lakes Justice Courthouse located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Kissell, Tyler. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********6061

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    University Lakes Justice Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Kissell, Tyler

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VALLEY INCOME PROPERTIES INC

Defendants

COURTNEY P WILBURN

DYLAN R LUNDY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Scott Williams

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/09/2020
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Writ, Sub Type: Restitution, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Imaged Case File, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • HearingEvent: Eviction Action Hearing; Result: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Judgment, Sub Type: For Plaintiff, Result: Signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • JudgementJudgment For: VALLEY INCOME PROPERTIES INC Judgment Against: DYLAN R LUNDY Judgment Against: COURTNEY P WILBURN, Amount: $1,936.00, Type: Rent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • JudgementJudgment For: VALLEY INCOME PROPERTIES INC Judgment Against: DYLAN R LUNDY Judgment Against: COURTNEY P WILBURN, Amount: $300.00, Type: Late Charge

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • JudgementJudgment For: VALLEY INCOME PROPERTIES INC Judgment Against: DYLAN R LUNDY Judgment Against: COURTNEY P WILBURN, Amount: $125.25, Type: Costs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • JudgementJudgment For: VALLEY INCOME PROPERTIES INC Judgment Against: DYLAN R LUNDY Judgment Against: COURTNEY P WILBURN, Amount: $125.00, Type: Attorney Fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • JudgementJudgment For: VALLEY INCOME PROPERTIES INC Judgment Against: DYLAN R LUNDY Judgment Against: COURTNEY P WILBURN, Amount: $20.00, Type: Notice Fees

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.