This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 10/29/2019 at 08:04:27 (UTC).

valley income properties inc vip1 VS CHRISTOPHER CHARLES

Case Summary

On 08/23/2017 valley income properties inc vip1 filed an Other lawsuit against CHRISTOPHER CHARLES. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, Manistee Justice Courthouse located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Watts, Donald. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********7664

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Manistee Justice Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Watts, Donald

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

valley income properties inc vip1

Defendant

CHRISTOPHER CHARLES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Scott Williams

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/07/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Writ, Sub Type: Restitution, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Writ, Sub Type: Restitution, Result: Signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Post/Mail, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Judgment, Sub Type: Default, Result: Signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2017
  • Judgment For: valley income properties inc vip1 Judgment Against: CHRISTOPHER CHARLES, Amount: $1,119.25, Type: Total Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less