Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 10/12/2019 at 21:22:41 (UTC).

US COLLECTIONS WEST VS CATHRINE CLARINO

Case Summary

On 07/01/2016 US COLLECTIONS WEST filed an Other lawsuit against CATHRINE CLARINO. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, Desert Ridge Justice Courthouse located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judges overseeing this case are Jayne, Clancy and Riggs, Cathy. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********7527

  • Filing Date:

    07/01/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Desert Ridge Justice Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judges

Jayne, Clancy

Riggs, Cathy

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

US COLLECTIONS WEST

Defendant

CATHRINE CLARINO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Alan Zimmerman

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/08/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: JDE Return, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Court Date, Result: Affirmed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Judgment, Sub Type: For Plaintiff, Result: Signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Statement of Costs, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit in Support of Attorney Fees, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Exhibit, Sub Type: Entered, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Appeal Notice of, Sub Type: Right to Appeal, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Ruling on Motion, Sub Type: Continue Trial, Result: Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Telephone Call, Result: Received

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Response, Sub Type: To Motion, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Motion, Sub Type: Continue Hearing, Result: Filed by Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Mediation, Sub Type: Disclosure and Confidentiality Agreement, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Court Date, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Mediation, Sub Type: Outcome Notice, Result: No Agreement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Order, Sub Type: Setting Mediation, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Answer, Sub Type: Civil Complaint, Result: Filed by Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Private Process, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2016
  • Judgment For: US COLLECTIONS WEST Judgment Against: CATHRINE CLARINO, Amount: $3,283.92, Type: Principal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2016
  • Judgment For: US COLLECTIONS WEST Judgment Against: CATHRINE CLARINO, Amount: $131.00, Type: Costs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2016
  • Judgment For: US COLLECTIONS WEST Judgment Against: CATHRINE CLARINO, Amount: $1,680.00, Type: Attorney Fee

    Read MoreRead Less