Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 10/15/2019 at 18:59:01 (UTC).

US COLLECTIONS WEST INC VS JANA MUSEL

Case Summary

On 10/17/2016 US COLLECTIONS WEST INC filed an Other lawsuit against JANA MUSEL. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, Encanto Justice Courthouse located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judges overseeing this case are McMurry, C. Steven and Cheuvront, Ken. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********6686

  • Filing Date:

    10/17/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Encanto Justice Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judges

McMurry, C. Steven

Cheuvront, Ken

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

US COLLECTIONS WEST INC

Defendant

JANA MUSEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Alan Zimmerman

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/06/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Petition Discharging Garnishee, Result: Signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Application for Order of Continuing Lien, Result: Signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Order, Sub Type: Undesignated, Result: Signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishee, Sub Type: Answer, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Garnishment Return, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Motion, Sub Type: Undesignated, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Application for Writ of Garnishment, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Judgment, Sub Type: Default, Result: Signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Request, Sub Type: Affidavit for Entry of Default Judgment, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Application for Entry of Default, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Private Process, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2017
  • Judgment For: US COLLECTIONS WEST INC Judgment Against: Jana Musel, Amount: $874.90, Type: Principal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2017
  • Judgment For: US COLLECTIONS WEST INC Judgment Against: Jana Musel, Amount: $61.46, Type: Interest

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2017
  • Judgment For: US COLLECTIONS WEST INC Judgment Against: Jana Musel, Amount: $176.00, Type: Costs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2017
  • Judgment For: US COLLECTIONS WEST INC Judgment Against: Jana Musel, Amount: $400.00, Type: Attorney Fee

    Read MoreRead Less