This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 11/05/2019 at 14:20:01 (UTC).

U.S. COLLECTIONS WEST, INC VS CHARISSE LOMBARDO

Case Summary

On 02/21/2018 U S COLLECTIONS WEST, INC filed an Other lawsuit against CHARISSE LOMBARDO. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, Desert Ridge Justice Courthouse located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Riggs, Cathy. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********6660

  • Filing Date:

    02/21/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Desert Ridge Justice Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Riggs, Cathy

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

U.S. COLLECTIONS WEST, INC

Defendant

CHARISSE LOMBARDO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Alan Zimmerman

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/29/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Judgment, Sub Type: For Plaintiff, Result: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Counsel, Sub Type: Statement of Costs, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Counsel, Sub Type: Affidavit in Support of Attorney Fees, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Counsel, Sub Type: Notice of Appearance, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Court Date, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Motion, Sub Type: Amend Complaint, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Joint ADR Statement, Sub Type: No Settlement Reached, Result: No Agreement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Document Received, Sub Type: Undesignated, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Order, Sub Type: Setting Mediation, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Answer, Sub Type: Civil Complaint, Result: Filed by Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Post/Mail, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Order, Sub Type: Alternative Service, Result: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Attempted Service, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Dismissal for Lack of Service, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • Judgment For: U.S. COLLECTIONS WEST, INC Judgment Against: CHARISSE LOMBARDO, Amount: $2,482.09, Type: Principal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • Judgment For: U.S. COLLECTIONS WEST, INC Judgment Against: CHARISSE LOMBARDO, Amount: $172.00, Type: Costs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • Judgment For: U.S. COLLECTIONS WEST, INC Judgment Against: CHARISSE LOMBARDO, Amount: $1,987.50, Type: Attorney Fee

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.