This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 10/19/2019 at 18:57:20 (UTC).

UNITED AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY VS Gabriela Herrera Garcia Et Al

Case Summary

On 02/23/2017 UNITED AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY filed an Other lawsuit against Gabriela Herrera Garcia. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, Encanto Justice Courthouse located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judges overseeing this case are McMurry, C. Steven and Cheuvront, Ken. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********7344

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Encanto Justice Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judges

McMurry, C. Steven

Cheuvront, Ken

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

UNITED AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendants

Gabriela Herrera Garcia

Eldeve Gonzalez

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Marc Gladner

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/23/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Judgment, Sub Type: Summary, Result: Signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Statement of Costs, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Corrective Action Notice Sent, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Ruling on Motion, Sub Type: Summary Judgment, Result: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Document Received, Sub Type: Undesignated, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Motion, Sub Type: Summary Judgment, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Change of Address, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Request, Sub Type: Affidavit for Entry of Default Judgment, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Answer, Sub Type: Civil Complaint, Result: Filed by Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Application for Entry of Default, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Private Process, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2018
  • Judgment For: UNITED AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY Judgment Against: Eldeve Gonzalez Judgment Against: Gabriela Herrera Garcia, Amount: $6,673.53, Type: Total Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less