This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 10/29/2019 at 04:35:32 (UTC).

UNITED AUTO CREDIT CORPORATION VS VICENTE ESTRELLA

Case Summary

On 08/17/2017 UNITED AUTO CREDIT CORPORATION filed an Other lawsuit against VICENTE ESTRELLA. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, North Mesa Justice Courthouse located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Ash, Cecil. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********3116

  • Filing Date:

    08/17/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North Mesa Justice Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Ash, Cecil

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

UNITED AUTO CREDIT CORPORATION

Defendant

VICENTE ESTRELLA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kenneth Seidberg

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/27/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Judgment, Sub Type: Default, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Statement of Costs, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit in Support of Attorney Fees, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Request, Sub Type: Affidavit for Entry of Default Judgment, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Application for Entry of Default, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Private Process, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Order, Sub Type: Alternative Service, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Motion, Sub Type: Alternative Service, Result: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Motion, Sub Type: Extension of Time to Serve, Result: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Order, Sub Type: Extend Time for Service, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Dismissal for Lack of Service, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • Judgment For: UNITED AUTO CREDIT CORPORATION Judgment Against: VICENTE ESTRELLA, Amount: $4,085.01, Type: Principal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • Judgment For: UNITED AUTO CREDIT CORPORATION Judgment Against: VICENTE ESTRELLA, Amount: $692.07, Type: Interest

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • Judgment For: UNITED AUTO CREDIT CORPORATION Judgment Against: VICENTE ESTRELLA, Amount: $249.72, Type: Costs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • Judgment For: UNITED AUTO CREDIT CORPORATION Judgment Against: VICENTE ESTRELLA, Amount: $395.00, Type: Attorney Fee

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.