This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 05/30/2020 at 13:25:36 (UTC).

UNIFUND CCR LLC VS CARYN M WICKS

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 UNIFUND CCR LLC filed an Other lawsuit against CARYN M WICKS. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, East Mesa Justice Courthouse located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Russell, Keith. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********5995

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    East Mesa Justice Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Russell, Keith

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

UNIFUND CCR LLC

Defendant

CARYN M WICKS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Todd Gurstel

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/16/2020
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Judgment, Sub Type: Default, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • JudgementJudgment For: UNIFUND CCR LLC Judgment Against: CARYN M WICKS, Amount: $4,222.45, Type: Principal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • JudgementJudgment For: UNIFUND CCR LLC Judgment Against: CARYN M WICKS, Amount: $154.00, Type: Costs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Statement of Costs, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Proof of Debt, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Request, Sub Type: Affidavit for Entry of Default Judgment, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Application for Entry of Default, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Private Process, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.