This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 03/01/2021 at 09:56:29 (UTC).

TRAILSIDE POINT HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC VS FREDDY VASQUEZ ORTEGA Et Al

Case Summary

On 12/31/2020 TRAILSIDE POINT HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC filed an Other lawsuit against FREDDY VASQUEZ ORTEGA. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, South Mountain Justice Courthouse located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Williams, Cody. The case status is Pending - Case Initiated.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1906

  • Filing Date:

    12/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Case Initiated

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    South Mountain Justice Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Williams, Cody

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TRAILSIDE POINT HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

Defendants

YANIRA HERRERA

FREDDY VASQUEZ ORTEGA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/11/2021
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Pending Dismissal of Lawsuit, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Private Process, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Affidavit of Attempted Service, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less