This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 10/12/2019 at 13:17:49 (UTC).

Todd Car Title Inc VS Lillian Shingleton

Case Summary

On 06/17/2016 Todd Car Title Inc filed an Other lawsuit against Lillian Shingleton. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, Encanto Justice Courthouse located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judges overseeing this case are McMurry, C. Steven and Cheuvront, Ken. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********8228

  • Filing Date:

    06/17/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Encanto Justice Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judges

McMurry, C. Steven

Cheuvront, Ken

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Todd Car Title Inc

TODD CAR TITLE, INC

Defendant

Lillian Shingleton

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Milton Mecham

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/09/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishee, Sub Type: Answer, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishee, Sub Type: Answer, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment, Sub Type: Order of Continuing Lien, Result: Signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishee, Sub Type: Answer, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Garnishment Return, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Application for Writ of Garnishment, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Garnishment Return, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Application for Writ of Garnishment, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Application for Writ of Garnishment, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Court Date, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 11/08/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Application for Entry of Default, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Publication, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Publication, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Order, Sub Type: Extend Time for Service, Result: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Motion, Sub Type: Extension of Time to Serve, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Undesignated, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2017
  • Judgment For: TODD CAR TITLE, INC Judgment Against: Lillian Shingleton, Amount: $316.16, Type: Principal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2017
  • Judgment For: TODD CAR TITLE, INC Judgment Against: Lillian Shingleton, Amount: $166.10, Type: Interest

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2017
  • Judgment For: TODD CAR TITLE, INC Judgment Against: Lillian Shingleton, Amount: $500.00, Type: Attorney Fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2017
  • Judgment For: TODD CAR TITLE, INC Judgment Against: Lillian Shingleton, Amount: $211.00, Type: Costs

    Read MoreRead Less